SB0594

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month

Sponsored by:

Senator Mathias

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim February as Maryland Sportsmanship Month; and requiring the proclamation to urge the Department of Natural Resources and specified local departments to observe Maryland Sportsmanship Month with specified activities.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Mathias, DeGrange, Edwards, and Salling
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0270
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Governor
Holidays and Special Dates
Natural Resources, Department of
Sports and Recreation
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(7-502 through 7-506, 7-502)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/3/20163/3/2016Hearing cancelled
3/7/20163/7/2016Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.