SB0618

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education - Employee Rights - Equal Employment Opportunity Program and Maryland Whistleblower Law

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Making specified provisions of law that relate to the Equal Employment Opportunity Program and Maryland Whistleblower Law applicable to the University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, and Baltimore City Community College; requiring specified boards of specified public institutions of higher education to adopt specified regulations; requiring that specified personnel actions be made in a specified manner; providing for specified options for specified complaint or grievance procedures; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Guzzone, Madaleno, Manno, and Ramirez
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0813
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Finance
Broad Subject(s):State Pensions and Retirement
Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Colleges
Discrimination
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(5-201, 5-202, 5-203, 5-204 through 5-209, 5-210 through 5-212, 5-213, 5-214, 5-215, 5-301, 5-302, 5-303, 5-304, 5-305, 5-306, 5-307, 5-308, 5-309)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Finance
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2/24/20162/24/2016Hearing cancelled
2/29/20162/29/2016Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.