SB0620

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Excluding as a father of a child a man who has committed a specified sexual crime against the child's mother for purposes of specified provisions relating to the paternity of a child in a guardianship or adoption proceeding under specified circumstances; requiring a court to consider a specified statement when making a specified finding; prohibiting a court from requiring publication of specified information under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Raskin, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Colburn, Currie, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Jacobs, Jennings, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Robey, Rosapepe, Shank, Stone, Young, and Zirkin
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0715
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0815 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Adoption
Child Custody
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Evidence
Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc
Guardians
Hearings
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Paternity
Privacy
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Sexual Offenses
Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony
Statutes:Article - Family Law
(5-306, 5-3A-06, 5-3B-05, 9-101.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed44
3/15/20133/15/2013Third Reading Passed (41-0)46
House3/18/20133/15/2013First Reading Judiciary48A
3/19/20133/19/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.