SB0624 (CH0318)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Insurance - Title Insurers - Title Insurance Commitment and Binders

Sponsored by:

Senator Feldman

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318


Synopsis:Altering specified information that a title insurer is required to include in specified disclosures; providing that a title insurance commitment or a specified sample form constitutes a specified written statement, is not a representation as to the state of title, and does not constitute a specified abstract; requiring a specified title insurance commitment or sample form to contain a specified statement; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Feldman
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0679
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Finance   View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Insurance - Other than Health
Narrow Subject(s):Agents and Brokers
Disclosure
Forms
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Real Property
Titles
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20141/30/2014First Reading Finance
2/5/20142/5/2014Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20142/27/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/28/20142/28/2014Favorable with Amendments {957272/1 Report Adopted36
Second Reading Passed with Amendments36
3/3/20143/3/2014Third Reading Passed (45-0)37
House3/4/20143/4/2014First Reading Economic Matters40
3/27/20143/27/2014Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/27/20143/22/2014Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
3/28/20143/23/2014Third Reading Passed (134-0)59
Senate3/31/20143/22/2014Returned Passed56
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.