SB0665

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Robotics Grant Program – Nonprofit Robotics Clubs

Sponsored by:

Senator Bates

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means


Synopsis:Altering the eligibility requirements for existing nonprofit robotics clubs to receive a grant under the Robotics Grant Program regardless of whether the nonprofit robotics club is associated with a public school.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Bates, Salling, Simonaire, and Waugh
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-123)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 29, 2018 3:51 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (45-2)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 4, 2018 7:25 P.M.