SB0666

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study Grading Policies in Maryland Schools

Sponsored by:

Senator Robinson

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Establishing the Task Force to Study Grading Policies in Maryland Schools; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Robinson
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 19, 2018 12:54 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 2, 2018 12:21 P.M.