SB0667 (CH0334)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment

Sponsored by:

Senator Jennings

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334


Synopsis:Authorizing a county board of education to administer the early learning assessment to enrolled prekindergarten students in the county; authorizing the assessment to be administered to a specified student for the purpose of identifying a disability; and requiring a county board to consult with prekindergarten teachers, including teachers nominated by the exclusive bargaining representative, in determining how to implement the assessment.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Jennings
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0548
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Rules and Regulations
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-210)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:12 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {764535/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/16/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (44-2)45
House3/16/20173/13/2017First Reading Ways and Means47
3/17/20173/17/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {515162/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (44-1)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:12 P.M.