SB0675

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

Senator Hough

Status:

In the Senate - Returned Passed


Synopsis:Requiring certain research facilities using dogs or cats for scientific research purposes to take certain steps to provide for the adoption of a certain dog or cat that is no longer needed for research purposes; authorizing certain research facilities to enter into collaborative agreements with animal rescue organizations for certain purposes; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Hough, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Eckardt, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Muse, Norman, Peters, Ramirez, Ready, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0732
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0420 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Agriculture
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Agriculture, Department of
Animals -see also- Birds; Dogs
Animal Shelters
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Dogs
Industry and Technology
Medical Research
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Statutes:Article - Agriculture
(15-101)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 4, 2018 8:56 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20182/5/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {504634/1 Report Adopted45
Floor Amendment {273925/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-26)45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)47
House3/15/20183/12/2018First Reading Appropriations46
3/23/20183/23/2018Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/4/20183/26/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/6/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)63
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 10:55 A.M.