SB0694 (CH0328)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328


Synopsis:Establishing the Behavior Analyst Advisory Committee within the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists; requiring the Board to adopt regulations and a code of ethics; requiring the Board to set fees for services provided by the Board to behavior analysts; providing for a behavior analyst rehabilitation subcommittee to evaluate and provide assistance to any behavior analyst in need of treatment and rehabilitation for alcoholism, drug abuse, chemical dependency, or other specified conditions; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Klausmeier, Colburn, Currie, Feldman, King, Kittleman, Mathias, Middleton, Robey, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0150
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Child Abuse and Neglect
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counselors -see also- Social Workers
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Electronic Government
Ethics
Evidence
Examinations
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Hearings
Job Training
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Mental Health
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Postal Service
Privacy
Public Information
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20141/31/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20142/5/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/13 at 1:45 p.m.
2/13/20142/13/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/14 at 1:45 p.m.
3/10/20143/10/2014Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/20143/17/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/20143/12/2014Favorable with Amendments {494034/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20143/13/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)47
House3/19/20143/16/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations52
3/26/20143/26/2014Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
3/28/20143/28/2014Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20144/3/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/3/20143/27/2014Favorable with Amendments {466287/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/4/20143/28/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)64
Senate4/7/20143/28/2014Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
Passed Enrolled62
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.