SB0703 (CH0210)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210


Synopsis:Establishing the Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program to provide funds to local jurisdictions to establish and expand community behavioral health crisis response systems; requiring that, for certain fiscal years, the Governor include in the budget bill certain appropriations for the Program; authorizing certain uses of funds distributed under the Program; requiring the Department of Health, by December 1 each year beginning in 2020, to report to the Governor and the General Assembly certain data regarding the Program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1092
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Appropriations
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Emergency Medical Services
Governor
Grants
Health, Department of
Jurisdiction
Mental and Behavioral Health
Reports
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(7.5-208)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 27, 2018 12:55 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/2/20182/2/2018First Reading Finance
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {317974/140
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted40
3/7/20183/7/2018Favorable with Amendments {317974/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/9/20183/9/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)43
House3/12/20183/9/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations43A
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
4/3/20184/3/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable with Amendments {296783/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/4/20183/26/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-5)60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (46-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.