SB0707 (CH0252)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator

Sponsored by:

Senator Ramirez

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from transporting a certain rapid fire trigger activator into the State or manufacturing, possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a certain rapid fire trigger activator, subject to a certain exception; defining "rapid fire trigger activator" as any device, including a removable manual or power-driven activating device, constructed so that, when installed in or attached to a firearm the rate at which the trigger is activated increases or the rate of fire increases; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Ramirez, Lee, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0888
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018, October 1, 2019
Committee(s):
Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Guns
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(4-301, 4-306, 4-305.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 27, 2018 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/2/20182/2/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments {498175/1 Report Adopted48
Floor Amendment {643520/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-28)48
Floor Amendment {883329/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (19-25)48
Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 48
Floor Amendment {303023/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (17-28)48A
Floor Amendment {883329/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-29)48A
Floor Amendment {233624/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)48A
Floor Amendment {593129/2 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-28)48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (36-11)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Judiciary50
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable Report Adopted64
Floor Amendment {773023/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (42-91)64
Second Reading Passed64
4/9/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed (111-29)66
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Returned Passed65
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.