SB0708

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations


Synopsis:Establishing the Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program and Fund; specifying the purposes of the Program and the Fund; requiring the Maryland Biotechnology Center in the Department of Business and Economic Development to administer the Fund; establishing criteria and award amounts for grants awarded under the Program; requiring recipients of Program funds to pay a royalty; requiring the Governor to make a specified appropriation beginning in fiscal year 2015; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Madaleno, Forehand, Garagiola, and Rosapepe
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0948
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Finance  Listen to Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Broad Subject(s):Economic and Community Development
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Grants
Health -see also- Mental Health
Industry and Technology
Investments -see also- Securities
Medical Research
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Smoking -see also- Cigarettes
Sunset
Tobacco
Statutes:Article - Economic Development
(5-1401 through 5-1406)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(6-226, 7-317)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Finance
2/5/20132/5/2013Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/21/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {207274/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (37-7)52
House3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations55A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.