SB0729 (CH0034)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34


Synopsis:Authorizing a county board of education to extend the length of the school year for up to 5 school days beyond June 15 without approval from the State Board of Education; and requiring a county board to submit a written application to the State Board for permission to increase the length of the school year for more than a certain number of school days in accordance with a certain provision of law or to decrease the length of the school year.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators King, Benson, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0553
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Public Schools
Time
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-103)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 11:18 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/2/20182/2/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments {384530/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/27/20183/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {965062/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-6)55
Senate4/2/20183/28/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments59
Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.