SB0735 (CH0426)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow Money

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426


Synopsis:Requiring the Board of County Commissioners of St. Mary's County, when the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission plans to borrow any money, to review and approve any loan application before the Commission submits the loan application to a lender.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0914
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
County Commissioners
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Public Local Laws
St. Mary's County
Statutes:Article - St. Mary's County
(113-2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2017 11:01 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/20173/8/2017Favorable with Amendments {684330/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/10/20173/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation43
3/28/20173/28/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {790715/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0)67
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:12 A.M.