SB0736

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to borrow not more than $26,300,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in St. Mary's County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0892
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Narrow Subject(s):County and Baltimore City Bonds
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Public Works
St. Mary's County
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2017 3:54 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/2/20173/2/2017Hearing canceled
3/15/20173/15/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/23/20173/21/2017Favorable with Amendments {779334/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/24/20173/22/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)51
House3/24/20173/21/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations55
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Appropriations
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/10/20174/3/2017Favorable Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
4/10/20174/4/2017Third Reading Passed (137-0)69
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 1:01 P.M.