SB0741 (CH0534)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees

Sponsored by:

Senator Jones-Rodwell

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534


Synopsis:Adding a trustee to the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to represent the interests of county governments; establishing the qualifications of the trustee; and requiring that the Governor appoint the trustee, who may be from a list submitted by the Maryland Association of Counties.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Jones-Rodwell and Colburn
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0390
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Budget and TaxationAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Pensions and Retirement
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Statutes:Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(21-104)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/21 at 8:30 a.m.
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/21 at 9:00 a.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/22/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {799039/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (43-4)52
House3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Appropriations55A
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/2/20133/27/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)62
Senate4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed61A
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.