SB0752 (CH0316)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Robey

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316


Synopsis:Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to develop and implement the Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program; requiring the Program to be established in multiple regions of the State; requiring the Secretary to coordinate with specified agencies on the establishment of the internships; specifying components of the Program; establishing eligibility standards for the Program; requiring the Secretary, in consultation with the Secretary of Human Resources, to issue a report to committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Robey, Astle, Garagiola, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Ramirez
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1119
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Finance  Listen to Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Social Services - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Budget and Management, Department of
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Foster Care
Job Training
Reports
Sunset
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - State Finance and Procurement
(3-207)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Finance
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {497479/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Appropriations51
3/25/20133/25/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)63
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.