SB0770

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Fraudulent Liens - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from filing false liens or encumbrances against specified individuals; providing for penalties for a violation of the Act; authorizing a specified person to file a specified action and obtain relief in specified circumstances; and authorizing a court to award compensatory damages and reasonable attorney's fees in a specified action.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Raskin, Colburn, King, Madaleno, Montgomery, Robey, Young, Forehand, Gladden, Jacobs, Muse, Shank, and Stone
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0941
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
State Government - Personnel
Narrow Subject(s):Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Damages
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Personal Property
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Real Property
State Employees
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-807)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {968674/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Judiciary51
3/23/20133/23/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.