SB0774 (CH0546)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol

Sponsored by:

Senator Mathias

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546


Synopsis:Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax in the amount of $3,500 for qualifying members of the Maryland Civil Air Patrol, subject to specified conditions; providing for a delayed effective date; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Mathias, Jennings, Klausmeier, Simonaire, Young, Jones-Rodwell, and McFadden
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1004
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0734 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  Listen to Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Aircraft
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rescue Squads -see also- Ambulances; Emergency Medical Serv
Volunteers -see also- Maryland Service Corps
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-208)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/21/20132/21/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
3/25/20133/25/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/25/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments {289037/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/26/20133/22/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)53
House3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations55A
4/2/20134/2/2013Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/3/20134/3/2013Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/6/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (132-0)65
Senate4/8/20134/2/2013Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.