SB0826

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Open Meetings Act - Violations and Penalties

Sponsored by:

Senator Kittleman

Status:

In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations


Synopsis:Requiring that a public body take specified actions if the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board determines that a violation of the Open Meetings Act has occurred; providing that compliance with specified provisions of the Act is not an admission to a specified violation and may not be used as evidence in a specified proceeding; repealing a prohibition on the introduction of opinions issued by the Board as evidence in specified proceedings; increasing the penalties for violations of the Open Meetings Act; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Kittleman and Robey
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0331
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee HearingRules and Executive Nominations
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Evidence
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Public Information
Signatures
Statutes:Article - State Government
(10-502.5, 10-510, 10-511)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20133/30/2013Favorable with Amendments {814438/1 Report Adopted61A
Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 61A
4/5/20134/1/2013Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/2/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations66

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.