SB0861

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties

Sponsored by:

Senator Zirkin

Status:

In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from committing a specified crime of violence when the person knows or reasonably should know that a minor is present in a residence; establishing specified circumstances under which a minor is present; establishing an enhanced penalty not exceeding 5 years for a violation of the Act; authorizing a court to impose an enhanced penalty if the State's Attorney provides a specified written notice to the defendant and if specified elements have been proven beyond a reasonable doubt; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Zirkin and Forehand
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0478
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Abduction
Arson
Assault
Burglary
Child Abuse and Neglect
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Indictments
Manslaughter
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Murder
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Robbery
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Violence -see also- Domestic Violence; Harassment
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-601.1)
Article - Public Safety
(5-101)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Senate Rules
2/13/20132/13/2013Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable with Amendments {758178/1 Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
3/29/20133/25/2013Third Reading Passed (46-1)56
House4/1/20133/26/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations59
4/5/20134/5/2013Rereferred to Judiciary
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.