SB0881 (CH0328)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Community Health Resources Commission - Revisions

Sponsored by:

Senator Middleton

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328


Synopsis:Authorizing the Community Health Resources Commission to contract with a specified third party for specified services; prohibiting a specified third party from releasing, publishing, or using in a specified manner specified information; providing that the power of the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene over a specified procurement procedure does not apply to the Commission; providing that, when procuring services or supplies, the Commission is subject to specified provisions of law; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Middleton
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0869
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Finance  Listen to Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Disclosure
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(19-2101, 19-2107, 19-2108, 19-2201)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Senate Rules
2/20/20132/20/2013Rereferred to Finance
2/21/20132/21/2013Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20132/22/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20133/27/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/27/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments {217075/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20133/24/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)55
House3/29/20133/25/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations58
4/2/20134/2/2013Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/3/20134/3/2013Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20134/6/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/8/20134/2/2013Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/8/20134/3/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)67
Senate4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.