SB0997

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission Bonds - Extension of Maximum Maturity Date

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations


Synopsis:Altering the maximum period of time from 30 to 40 years after which specified bonds issued by the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission mature.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0889
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingRules and Executive Nominations
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):County and Baltimore City Bonds
St. Mary's County
Statutes:Article - St. Mary's County
(113-6)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Senate Rules
2/18/20162/19/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
2/24/20162/24/2016Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20163/30/2016Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/6/20163/31/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)60
House4/7/20163/31/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations63

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.