SB1018

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties

Sponsored by:

Senator Reilly

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules


Synopsis:Altering the membership and duties of the Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth; authorizing youth or young adult members of the Task Force to receive a specified stipend as compensation for serving on the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to issue its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly in a preliminary report on or before November 1, 2014, and in a final report on or before June 1, 2015; and extending to June 30, 2015 the termination date of the Task Force.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Reilly
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0577
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Rules
Broad Subject(s):Children
Economic and Community Development
Narrow Subject(s):Baltimore City
Children, Governor's Office for
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Human Rights
Indigent Persons
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Prince George's County
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Social Services -see also- Welfare
Sunset
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:57 P.M.