SB1024 (CH0607)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - State Grants for Education Aid

Sponsored by:

Senator McFadden

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607


Synopsis:Establishing the criteria for a county board of education to be eligible to receive supplemental prekindergarten State grants in fiscal years 2018 through 2020; making specified grants to Baltimore City Public Schools subject to Baltimore City providing specified local contributions; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to make specified disbursements; requiring a specified audit; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to develop a specified financial recovery plan; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators McFadden and Ready
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0684
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Grants
Kent County
Public Schools
Reports
Statutes:Article - Education
(5-202, 5-218)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:14 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/8/20172/8/2017First Reading Senate Rules
2/15/20172/15/2017Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
2/16/20172/16/2017Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20173/28/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20173/25/2017Favorable with Amendments {909739/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/30/20173/26/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)55
House3/30/20173/26/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations60
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Appropriations
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/7/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed (131-7)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:14 P.M.