SB1034

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum

Sponsored by:

Senator Mathias

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $200,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Mayor and City Council of the City of Pocomoke and the Board of Directors of the Delmarva Discovery Center & Museum, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum, located in Worcester County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a specified requirement; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Mathias
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1573
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2017 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 191). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 191 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):State Debt (Bond Bills)
Narrow Subject(s):Museums
State Bonds
Worcester County
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/17/20162/17/2016First Reading Senate Rules
2/18/20162/19/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
3/2/20163/2/2016Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.