SB1035

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants and Farebox Recovery Rate

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.


Synopsis:Repealing the requirement that a percentage of operating costs for specified public transit services must be recovered by the Maryland Transit Administration from specified revenues; altering requirements for annual reports submitted by the Administration to the General Assembly; altering a provision of law concerning the amount of a specified grant that the Department of Transportation is required to provide to the Washington Suburban Transit District for a share of the regional transit operating deficits; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Madaleno, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Kagan, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0891
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Transportation - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Auditors and Audits
Buses -see also- School Buses
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads
Railroads
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(7-208)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/17/20162/17/2016First Reading Senate Rules
2/18/20162/19/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
2/24/20162/24/2016Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
3/2/20163/2/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.