Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session



Education - Physical and Digital Infrastructure in the Public Schools - Assessment

Sponsored by:

Senator Rosapepe


In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means

Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education, on or before December 1, 2016, and in cooperation and coordination with local school systems in the State, to conduct an assessment of the physical and digital infrastructure needed, on or before December 31, 2019, to support the integration of digital devices into the State's education program for all public school students; and requiring the assessment be submitted to specified committees of the General Assembly by December 15, 2016.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Rosapepe, Bates, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, McFadden, Peters, Ramirez, Salling, Simonaire, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Industry and Technology
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.