SB1048

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil Penalties

Sponsored by:

Senator Pipkin

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Requiring the refund, before October 1, 2013, of all civil penalties paid for alleged violations recorded by work zone speed control systems under the Maryland SafeZones Program between June 22, 2010 and March 31, 2012.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Pipkin
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Transportation - Highways
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Narrow Subject(s):Citations
Construction
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Recordings -see also- Video
Traffic Regulation
Video
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:11 P.M.