SB1052

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)

Sponsored by:

Senator Kittleman

Status:

In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from using an interactive computer service to maliciously engage in a specified course of conduct that inflicts serious emotional distress on a minor or places a minor in reasonable fear of death or serious bodily injury under specified circumstances; and defining terms.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Kittleman
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0396
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Harassment
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Pornography -see also- Nudity and Sexual Displays; Obscenity
Privacy
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-805)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate3/4/20133/4/2013First Reading Senate Rules
3/6/20133/7/2013Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
3/7/20133/7/2013Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable with Amendments {508972/1 Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
3/29/20133/25/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)56
House4/1/20133/26/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations59
4/5/20134/5/2013Rereferred to Judiciary
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:11 P.M.