SB1107

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition

Sponsored by:

Senator Manno

Status:

In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "qualified Maryland biotechnology company" to extend a specified period of time from a specified date that an active business may claim the biotechnology tax credit; and applying the Act to initial tax credit certificates issued after June 30, 2016.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Manno, Edwards, Feldman, Hough, King, Madaleno, McFadden, Serafini, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1554
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Industry and Technology
Investments -see also- Securities
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-725)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/22/20162/22/2016First Reading Senate Rules
3/1/20163/2/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
3/2/20163/2/2016Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
3/21/20163/21/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/21/20163/18/2016Favorable Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed47A
3/21/20163/19/2016Third Reading Passed (44-0)48A
House3/22/20163/20/2016First Reading Ways and Means52
3/28/20163/28/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.