SB1165 (CH0790)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time Limit

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790


Synopsis:Extending from 5 years to 20 years the length of time that student data and workforce data used by the Maryland Longitudinal Data System is limited to being linked beyond the date of latest attendance in any educational institution in the State; and prohibiting the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center from selling specified protected information; and prohibiting the Center from charging specified fees.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0680
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Appropriations
Broad Subject(s):Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Students
Time
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(24-702, 24-703)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate3/1/20173/1/2017First Reading Senate Rules
3/16/20173/17/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/20173/17/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {134436/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20173/24/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)53
House3/28/20173/23/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations57
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (96-39)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 12:54 P.M.