SB1174

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an Institution

Sponsored by:

Senator Jennings

Status:

Veto sustained (0-44)


Synopsis:Requiring the attending clinician or a designee of the attending clinician to prepare a certificate of birth, secure specified signatures, and file the certificate within 5 calendar days after a birth occurs outside an institution with an attending clinician; requiring the attending clinician, within 5 calendar days after the birth, to provide the date of birth and specified information that is required on a certificate of birth; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Jennings, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1632
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Emergency Bills
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Signatures
Vital Records
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(4-201, 4-208)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 12, 2018 3:29 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate3/6/20173/6/2017First Reading Senate Rules
3/9/20173/10/2017Rereferred to Finance
3/10/20173/10/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20173/24/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/24/20173/22/2017Favorable with Amendments {537178/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/27/20173/23/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)52
House3/27/20173/22/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations56
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (135-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/12/20181/12/2018Veto sustained (0-44)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 12, 2018 3:29 P.M.