SJ0002 (JR0002)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2


Synopsis:Repealing and withdrawing specified applications to Congress to call a Constitutional Convention; and urging the legislatures of specified other states to repeal and withdraw such applications.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Madaleno, Conway, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HJ0002
Introduced in a prior session as: SJ0005 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingRules and Executive Nominations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - General Assembly
Narrow Subject(s):Congress, U.S.
Constitutional Amendments
Constitution, U.S.
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:14 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20171/25/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/20171/27/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20172/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/20172/28/2017Favorable with Amendments {174339/233
Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 33
3/1/20173/1/2017Favorable with Amendments {174339/2 Adopted34
Floor Amendment {793128/1 (Senator Conway) Adopted34
Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 34
3/2/20173/2/2017Floor Amendment {263324/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-32)35
Floor Amendment {113123/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted35
Floor Amendment {543924/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
3/6/20173/6/2017Third Reading Passed (34-13)37
House3/7/20173/7/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations40
3/27/20173/27/2017Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {883223/1 Report Adopted61
Floor Amendment {513621/1 (Delegate Metzgar) Rejected (49-89)61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (93-47)62
Senate4/6/20173/31/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments60
Third Reading Passed (34-13)60
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:14 P.M.