SB0485 (CH0322)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Remote Classroom Technology Grant Program - Establishment (Peyton's Bill)

Sponsored by:

Senator Serafini

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322


Synopsis:Establishing the Remote Classroom Technology Grant Program to provide grants to public schools to purchase technology to allow students with medical conditions to participate in classrooms remotely if in-person attendance is not possible; requiring the State Department of Education to implement and administer the Program; authorizing the Governor to include in the State budget an annual appropriation to the Program; and authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Serafini, Bates, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, Salling, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0197
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Education, State Department of
Grants
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Industry and Technology
Rules and Regulations
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-124)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/20171/31/2017Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2/23/20172/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/20172/24/2017Favorable with Amendments {644538/1 Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/28/20172/28/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)33
House3/1/20173/1/2017First Reading Ways and Means36
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)61
Senate4/3/20173/28/2017Returned Passed57
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:11 P.M.