Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0004 / CH0378Alcoholic Beverages - Vaportinis and Similar Devices - ProhibitedDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 378Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0208 / CH0518
    (SB0546 / CH0517)
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and LabelsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0261
    (SB0161 / CH0278)
Alcoholic Beverages - Hard Cider - DefinitionDelegate MinnickVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0337 / CH0394Farm Breweries - Location and Self-DistributionDelegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0356 / CH0596Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival LicensesDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 596Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0359 / CH0272
    (SB0075 / CH0271)
Alcoholic Beverages - Maximum Alcohol ContentDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 272Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0372Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed EstablishmentsDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0464 / CH0407Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses - Retail Sale - Prepackaged BeerDelegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 407Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0600 / CH0414Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Market Permit - EstablishmentDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 414Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0774
    (SB0445)
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production LimitDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0830
    (SB0287)
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at RetailDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0964Alcoholic Beverages - Unlawful Drinking or Possessing an Open Container - Failure to Appear in CourtDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1101
    (SB0859)
Alcoholic Beverages - Advertising RegulationsDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
SB0075 / CH0271
    (HB0359 / CH0272)
Alcoholic Beverages - Maximum Alcohol ContentSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 271Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0161 / CH0278
    (HB0261)
Alcoholic Beverages - Hard Cider - DefinitionSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 278Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0209Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic BeveragesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0226 / CH0280Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site PermitSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 280Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0287
    (HB0830)
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at RetailSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0445
    (HB0774)
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production LimitSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0546 / CH0517
    (HB0208 / CH0518)
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and LabelsSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0859
    (HB1101)
Alcoholic Beverages - Advertising RegulationsSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0888Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, Class C, and Class D LicensesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.