Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0042 / CH0314Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery LicensesDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0071
    (SB0210 / CH0467)
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food ServiceDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB0252 / CH0315Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor and WineDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 315Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0292 / CH0317
    (SB0491 / CH0318)
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft BeerDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0296Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine LicensesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0380
    (SB0937)
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open ContainerDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
HB0464 / CH0466Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition PermitDelegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 466Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0742Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery LicensesDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0780Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permits - Harford County Farm FairDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0792 / CH0524Office of Legislative Audits - Performance Audits - Local Alcoholic Beverages Licensing BoardsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 524Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0897
    (SB0684)
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0987 / CH0468Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shipper's Permit - Application and Renewal RequirementsDelegate Miller, W.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1024
    (SB0718)
Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery PermitDelegate MautzIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1283 / CH0813Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery LicenseDelegate BranchEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1327Task Force on Local Alcoholic Beverages RegulationDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1328Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses - Samples and Sales of ProductDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1338Alcoholic Beverages - Wholesalers - Payment on DeliveryDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB1386 / CH0519Maryland Public Ethics Law - Members and Employees of Boards of License Commissioners and Liquor Control BoardsDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Environment and Transportation
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1420Alcoholic Beverages - Modern Brewery LicenseDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1531Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Winery Licenses - Auxiliary Winery PermitsDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1555Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - ServiceDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1582
    (SB1138 / CH0469)
Alcoholic Beverages - Family Beer and Wine Facility PermitDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0210 / CH0467
    (HB0071)
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food ServiceSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 467Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0275Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Village PermitSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0281 / CH0316Alcoholic Beverages - Definition of Beer - Hard CiderSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0325Alcoholic Beverages - On-Premises Promotions and Product Sampling - Holders of Manufacturer's LicensesSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0491 / CH0318
    (HB0292 / CH0317)
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft BeerSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 318Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0684
    (HB0897)
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0718
    (HB1024)
Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery PermitSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0937
    (HB0380)
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open ContainerSenator SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judiciary
SB1138 / CH0469
    (HB1582)
Alcoholic Beverages - Family Beer and Wine Facility PermitSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 469Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1172Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Breweries - Barrelage and Hours of SaleSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.