Operating Budget (B1)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0059Dedicated State Funds Protection ActDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0100 / CH0423
    (SB0125)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014)SpeakerEnacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 423AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0240Operating Budget - Capital Gains Tax Revenue - Appropriation to Revenue Stabilization AccountDelegate JamesIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0686Professional Boards Special Funds - Transfer of Funds - Three-Fifths Committee VoteDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0914County Income Tax Disparity Grants - AlterationsDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report AdoptedAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1474
    (SB0958)
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital FundsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1494 / CH0688
    (SB0876)
Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - FundingDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 688Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0125
    (HB0100 / CH0423)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014)PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0831State Budget - Evidence-Based Policy OptionsSenator KasemeyerIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0876
    (HB1494 / CH0688)
Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - FundingSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0958
    (HB1474)
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital FundsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB1055State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort RequirementsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.