Operating Budget (B1)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0070 / CH0310
    (SB0055)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016)SpeakerEnacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 310AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0210
    (SB0268)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0215
    (SB0183 / CH0477)
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - RequirementDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0633Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation PlansDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
HB0787Dedicated State Funds Protection ActDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0855Law Enforcement Explorer Program - FundingDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1211State Budget - Board of Public Works - Notice of Reductions in AppropriationsDelegate KormanIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0055
    (HB0070 / CH0310)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016)PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0171Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road PropertySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0183 / CH0477
    (HB0215)
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - RequirementSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
SB0268
    (HB0210)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipSenator HoughIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0660State BudgetSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0862 / CH0389Maryland Park Service - Operations Revenue - Mandated AppropriationSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0885Education Funding and Formulas - Amendment - Supermajority VoteSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.