Operating Budget (B1)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0028 / CH0557Unappropriated General Fund Surplus - Appropriation to Pension Fund and Postretirement Health Benefits Trust FundDelegate KrimmApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
HB0150 / CH0150
    (SB0170)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2018)SpeakerEnacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 150AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0265Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Fund - Phased-In IncreaseDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB0267
    (SB0257)
Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - IncreaseDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Returned PassedAppropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0420
    (SB0303)
Commonsense Spending Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0430
    (SB0306)
Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0442Volkswagen Settlement Funds - Use of Environmental Mitigation TrustDelegate RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0503 / CH0004
    (SB0371 / CH0550)
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization AccountDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 4Appropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0708 / CH0551State Department of Education - Lacrosse Opportunities Program - Youth Lacrosse Nonprofit OrganizationsDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0984
    (SB0475)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and ReportingDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
Appropriations
HB1187
    (SB0784)
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget AppropriationDelegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0161Transportation - Highway User Revenues - AllocationSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0170
    (HB0150 / CH0150)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2018)PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
SB0172
    (HB0152 / CH0023)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0257
    (HB0267)
Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - IncreaseSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0303
    (HB0420)
Commonsense Spending Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0306
    (HB0430)
Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0371 / CH0550
    (HB0503 / CH0004)
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization AccountSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0475
    (HB0984)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and ReportingSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0690State BudgetSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
SB0784
    (HB1187)
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget AppropriationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0839Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State BudgetSenator SerafiniIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersBudget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB1198 / CH0019Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017Prince George's County SenatorsEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:51 P.M.