Operating Budget (B1)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0160
    (SB0185)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2019)SpeakerIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriations
HB0161
    (SB0187 / CH0010)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0348
    (SB0293)
Commonsense Spending Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0557Primary and Secondary Education - Education Trust Fund - Use of FundDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0954
    (SB0481)
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Reserve Fund - Mandated AppropriationDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1233
    (SB1248)
Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - FundingDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1245Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development AuthorityDelegate McKayIn the House - Returned PassedAppropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1339
    (SB0213)
State Budget - Mandated Appropriations - ReductionsDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB1620
    (SB0976)
Local Health Services Funding - ModificationsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1697
    (SB1122)
Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional AmendmentDelegate McIntoshIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedAppropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
HB1772
    (SB1206)
Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and ReportingDelegate McIntoshIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationAppropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1804Health – Medical Research FundingDelegate BuschIn the House - Returned PassedAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0185
    (HB0160)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2019)PresidentIn the House - Passed EnrolledBudget and TaxationAppropriations
SB0187 / CH0010
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB0192Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State BudgetSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 p.m.
SB0213
    (HB1339)
State Budget - Mandated Appropriations - ReductionsSenator WaughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0223Transportation - Highway User Revenues - AllocationSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
SB0293
    (HB0348)
Commonsense Spending Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0481
    (HB0954)
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Reserve Fund - Mandated AppropriationSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0820State BudgetSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0976
    (HB1620)
Local Health Services Funding - ModificationsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
SB1122
    (HB1697)
Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional AmendmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
SB1206
    (HB1772)
Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and ReportingSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledBudget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1248
    (HB1233)
Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - FundingSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

April 18, 2018 3:48 P.M.