Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0288 / CH0096St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
HB0452
    (SB0369 / CH0045)
Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial HospitalDelegate BeitzelVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
HB0546
    (SB0508 / CH0060)
Washington County - Public Facilities BondsWashington County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
HB0802
    (SB0458 / CH0056)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0846
    (SB0588 / CH0063)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0369 / CH0045
    (HB0452)
Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial HospitalSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0458 / CH0056
    (HB0802)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 56Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0508 / CH0060
    (HB0546)
Washington County - Public Facilities BondsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 60Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0588 / CH0063
    (HB0846)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.