Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0545
    (SB0555 / CH0063)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
HB1184
    (SB0168 / CH0043)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
SB0168 / CH0043
    (HB1184)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0555 / CH0063
    (HB0545)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.