Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0205 / CH0254
    (SB0296)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1155Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0296
    (HB0205 / CH0254)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0307 / CH0182Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 182Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.