Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0251 / CH0435
    (SB0323)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0892 / CH0427
    (SB0736)
St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1439
    (SB0473 / CH0080)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0323
    (HB0251 / CH0435)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0473 / CH0080
    (HB1439)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0736
    (HB0892 / CH0427)
St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 30, 2017 1:02 P.M.