Prior Authorizations (B4)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0750 / CH0272
    (SB0116)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013 and 2014 - Baltimore City - Skatepark of Baltimore at Roosevelt ParkDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0925
    (SB0744 / CH0196)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Montgomery County - Water Park at Bohrer ParkDelegate BarveVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0116
    (HB0750 / CH0272)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013 and 2014 - Baltimore City - Skatepark of Baltimore at Roosevelt ParkSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0744 / CH0196
    (HB0925)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Montgomery County - Water Park at Bohrer ParkSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.