Capital Budget (B5)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0101 / CH0424
    (SB0126)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 424AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
HB0115 / CH0426
    (SB0141)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 426Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0146
    (SB0174)
Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement RequestsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0616 / CH0123Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 123Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0685
    (SB0633 / CH0512)
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost ShareDelegate GriffithIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0771Mass Transit Trust FundDelegate BatesIn the House - Reassigned to Ways and Means and AppropriationsWays and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1249Baltimore City - School Construction - Block GrantsDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1474
    (SB0958)
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital FundsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1510Montgomery County - Transportation - Block GrantMontgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0126
    (HB0101 / CH0424)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
SB0141
    (HB0115 / CH0426)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0174
    (HB0146)
Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement RequestsAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0569Capital Budget - Local Initiatives - Matching FundsSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0633 / CH0512
    (HB0685)
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost ShareSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0743
    (HB0860 / CH0647)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Senator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and TaxationRules and Executive Nominations
SB0958
    (HB1474)
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital FundsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.