Capital Budget (B5)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0015
    (SB0470)
Public School Facilities Security Improvements ProgramDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0103Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General AssemblyChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB0161
    (SB0171 / CH0463)
Creation of State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, and 2013SpeakerIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriations
HB0821
    (SB0998 / CH0575)
Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationAppropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1064Capital Budget - Payment of State Debt ServiceDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1274Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
HB1532
    (SB1094)
Capital Grant Program for Public School Systems With Significant Enrollment GrowthDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0171 / CH0463
    (HB0161)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, and 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Budget and Taxation Appropriations
SB0470
    (HB0015)
Public School Facilities Security Improvements ProgramSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0726Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital FundsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0821Digital Equity for All Maryland Students Act of 2014Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0998 / CH0575
    (HB0821)
Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 575Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB1094
    (HB1532)
Capital Grant Program for Public School Systems With Significant Enrollment GrowthSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.