Capital Budget (B5)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0108
    (SB0457)
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship RequirementsDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/3/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
HB0151
    (SB0191 / CH0027)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
HB0309
    (SB0324 / CH0013)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016Delegate BuschIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledAppropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0463
    (SB0379 / CH0198)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0722 / CH0666
    (SB0271 / CH0665)
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms - FundingDelegate HixsonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0191 / CH0027
    (HB0151)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015PresidentEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27Budget and TaxationAppropriations
SB0271 / CH0665
    (HB0722 / CH0666)
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms - FundingSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 665Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0280 / CH0061Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0324 / CH0013
    (HB0309)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016Senator MillerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0379 / CH0198
    (HB0463)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 198Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0457
    (HB0108)
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship RequirementsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
Budget and Taxation

Denotes enacted legislation

September 25, 2016 11:08 A.M.