Capital Budget (B5)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0138
    (SB1080)
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System RequirementDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB0162
    (SB0186 / CH0009)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017SpeakerIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriations
HB0372 / CH0352
    (SB0277 / CH0351)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1783 / CH0014
    (SB1243)
21st Century School Facilities ActDelegate JonesGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0186 / CH0009
    (HB0162)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 9Budget and TaxationAppropriations
SB0277 / CH0351
    (HB0372 / CH0352)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB1064 / CH0553Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1080
    (HB0138)
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System RequirementSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1243
    (HB1783 / CH0014)
21st Century School Facilities ActSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:30 P.M.